+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: AP To AE
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: AE To AP
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Apportionment and Elections;Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 13, 2014: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor