+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Amendment Failed
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2019: Passed (Senate)
February 20, 2019: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor