+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: AP To TR
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: TR To AP
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation;Appropriations