+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Harkins,Bryan,Hopson
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Massengill
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means