+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 4, 2021: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor