+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation