+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 4, 2015: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor