+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Property
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Public Property