+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Bain, Formby, Boyd)
- Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Revenue and Expenditure General Bills
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 1, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor