+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statutes Amended (31)
- 007-0007-0211 -
- 025-0009-0107 -
- 025-0011-0103 -
- 025-0041-0003 -
- 031-0007-0013 -
- 027-0071-0001 -
- 027-0071-0005 -
- 027-0071-0007 -
- 027-0071-0009 -
- 027-0071-0011 -
- 027-0071-0013 -
- 027-0071-0015 -
- 027-0071-0017 -
- 027-0071-0023 -
- 027-0071-0027 -
- 027-0071-0029 -
- 067-0001-0005 -
- 067-0001-0009 -
- 067-0001-0018 -
- 067-0001-0019 -
- 067-0001-0033 -
- 067-0001-0037 -
- 067-0001-0043 -
- 067-0001-0045 -
- 067-0001-0049 -
- 067-0001-0051 -
- 067-0001-0073 -
- 067-0005-0005 -
- 067-0005-0011 -
- 067-0005-0013 -
- 067-0001-0041 -
+ − Vote
March 9, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor