+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Vote
February 10, 2021: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor