+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy;Finance
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Powell, Hale)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
- DR - TSDPCS: WM To EN
- DR - TSDPCS: EN To WM
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Energy;Ways and Means
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
February 4, 2021: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor