+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Interstate Cooperation