+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections;Rules
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Apportionment and Elections