+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: CR To JB
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corrections;Judiciary, Division B
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B