+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: AP To TR
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: TR To AP
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation;Appropriations