+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Bryan,Simmons (12th),Turner-Ford
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Conferees Named Gipson,Bailey,Ladner
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPAA: JB To AP
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B;Appropriations
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2018: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 27, 2018: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 7, 2018: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 8, 2018: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor