+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Education