+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Drug Policy
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Drug Policy
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: Passed (Senate)
February 4, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor