+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees Named Bounds,Stamps,Read
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees Named Bounds,Anderson (122nd),Read
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Carter,Parks,Harkins
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
- Reconsidered
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Lamar, Bounds, Anderson (122nd))
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Immediate Release
- Passed As Amended
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Tabled
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
- DR - TSDPCS: AP To PU
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- DR - TSDPCS: PU To AP
On January 17, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Public Utilities;Appropriations
+ − Votes (5)
March 30, 2022: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 29, 2022: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 3, 2022: Concurred in Amend From Senate (House)
March 2, 2022: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 10, 2022: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor