+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means