+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B;Appropriations
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider W/Drawn
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Smith, Willis, Clarke)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Drug Policy
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 7, 2018: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor