+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 18, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
- Conferees Named Simmons (13th),Browning,Hudson
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Conferees Named Johnson,Massengill,Rogers (14th)
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Amended
- Reconsidered
- Passed As Amended
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: AP To TR
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: TR To AP
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation;Appropriations