+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 1, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 08/01/19
- Chapter number 27
On August 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/19
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 27 05/17/2019
- Governor's action Approval 05/17/2019
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/17/2019
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/17/19
- Governor approval 05/17/19
- Presented to Governor 05/17/19
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 14, 2019
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF823
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Author stricken Carlson
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Author added Jasinski
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government
- Introduction and first reading