+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Author added Sieben
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Author added Marty
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chief author added Dibble
- Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Cohen
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authors stricken Johnson; Latz; Rosen; Sheran
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Introduction and first reading