+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 20, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter number 176
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/20/18
- Governor approval 05/20/18
On May 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 176 05/20/18
- Secretary of State Chapter 176 05/20/18
- Governor's action Approval 05/20/18
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/17/18
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/17/18
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading
- Bill was passed
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 16, 2018
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1609
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor