+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date Various
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- See also SF6, Sec. 3 (First Special Session)
- Governor's action Approval 05/23/15
- Secretary of State Chapter 77 05/23/15
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter number 77
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- (Non-revisor companion) HF495
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/23/2015
- Governor approval 05/23/2015
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/20/15
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/20/2015
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill vote: 45-20
- Third reading
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- House adopted conference committee report
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Third reading as amended by Conference
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- House adopted SCC report and repassed bill
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- House conferees Anderson, S.; Albright; O'Driscoll; Loonan; Laine
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House conferees Anderson, S.; Albright; O'Driscoll; Loonan; Laine
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Senate conferees Saxhaug, Pappas, Carlson, Wiklund, Metzen
- Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
- House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees Saxhaug; Pappas; Carlson; Wiklund; Metzen
- Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
- Returned from House with amendment
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Amended
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
- Point of order raised, ruled well taken
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 24, 2015
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to State and Local Government
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor