+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date Various
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/23/2015
- Governor approval 05/23/2015
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 67 05/23/15
- Governor's action Approval 05/23/15
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter number 67
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/20/15
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/20/2015
On May 17, 2015 in the House:
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
On May 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill
- Third reading
On May 17, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading as amended by Conference
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- House adopted conference committee report
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference
On May 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- House adopted SCC report and repassed bill
On May 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- House conferees Cornish; Scott; Schoen
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from House with amendment
- Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- Senate conferees Latz, Kent, Hall
- House conferees Cornish, Scott, and Schoen.
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees Latz; Kent; Hall
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Amended
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 14, 2015
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF222
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
- Third reading Passed
- Motion did not prevail to lay bill on the table
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Transportation and Public Safety
- Comm report: Amend previous comm report
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Introduction and first reading