+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter number 63
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto message laid on table
- Secretary of State Chapter 63 05/16/17
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill
- Third reading
- House adopted SCC report and repassed bill
- Presentment date 05/15/17
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Motion to adopt conference committee report
- Motion prevailed
- Third reading as amended by Conference
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference
- Presented to Governor 05/15/17
- Governor veto 5/15/2017
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Veto 05/15/17
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- House conferees Cornish; Johnson, B.; Zerwas; Scott; Hilstrom
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
- Senate conferees Limmer; Relph; Johnson; Anderson, B.; Latz
- House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed
- House conferees Cornish; Johnson, B.; Zerwas; Scott; and Hilstrom.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees Limmer; Relph; Johnson; Anderson, B.; Latz
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from House with amendment
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 3, 2017
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor