+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter number 45
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto message laid on table
- See First Special Session, SF2
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 45 05/12/17
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Governor veto 05/12/17
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Veto 05/12/17
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Conference committee report, delete everything
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill vote: 34-33
- Third reading
- House adopted SCC report and repassed bill
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
- Motion to return bill to conference committee
- Motion to adopt conference committee report
- Motion did not prevail
- House adopted conference committee report question recurred.
- Third reading as amended by Conference
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference
- Presented to Governor 5/9/2017
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/09/17
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- House conferees Dean, M.; Schomacker; Albright; Kiel; Schultz
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from House with amendment
- Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- House conferees Dean, M.; Schomacker; Albright; Kiel; Schultz.
- Senate conferees Benson; Abeler; Housley; Utke; Lourey
- House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees Benson; Abeler; Housley; Utke; Lourey
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Amended
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
- Point of order raised, ruled well taken
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 7, 2017
- Second reading
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Author added Abeler
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor