+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance
- Received from Senate
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- See HF470, Art. 2, Sec. 18
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Author added Schoen
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Author added Hall
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Author added Latz
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor