+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 644
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 571
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 467
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 346
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading