+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 4.20, interim disposition of bills, returned to Ways and Means
- Second reading
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF548
- Received from Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor