+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 1, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date 01/01/2016
- Chapter number 5
On January 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 01/01/16
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 5 03/19/15
- Governor's action Approval 03/19/15
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Governor approval 03/19/15
- Secretary of State, Filed 3/19/15
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 03/17/15
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 03/17/15
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 16, 2015
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF383
- Received from Senate
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Order
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Introduction and first reading