+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF356
- Received from Senate
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- See SF45, First Special Session, 2020
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended
- Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Author added Hoffman
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Author added Tomassoni
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
- Introduction and first reading