+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- See HF 2402
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to lay on the table
- Reported to the House
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 19, 2013
- Second reading
- Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF739
- Received from Senate
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 64-0)
- Special Order
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor