+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Reconsidered
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On May 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance
On April 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor