+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
- Governor's action Approval 03/17/2020
- Secretary of State Chapter 70 03/17/2020
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date 03/18/20
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 03/17/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter number 70
- Secretary of State, Filed 03/17/20
- Governor approval 03/17/20
- Presented to Governor 03/17/20
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Senate file first reading
- Rules suspended, urgency declared
- Second reading
- Third reading
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Referred to Finance
- Comm report: To pass as amended
- Urgency declared rules suspended
- Second reading
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Received from Senate