+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- See HF1233, Art. 3, Sec. 37-40, 48; Art. 12, Sec. 43-45; Art. 14, Sec. 2, Sub. 6, Sec. 3, Sub. 2
- Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health, Human Services and Housing
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Author added Rosen
- Author stricken Franzen
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Author added Nelson
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Introduction and first reading