+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Author added Cwodzinski
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Author added Carlson
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Author added Marty
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Author added Dziedzic
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading