+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- See HF2749, Art. 13, Sec. 66
- Authors added Koenen; Eken
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Author added Ruud
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn and re-referred to State and Local Government
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor