+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter number 132
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- See SF3141, Art. 1, Sec. 47
- Effective date 05/15/18
- Secretary of State Chapter 132 05/14/18
- Governor's action Approval 05/14/18
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Governor approval 05/14/18
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/14/18
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/10/18
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/10/18
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading
- Bill was passed
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 08, 2018
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3441
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Author added Eken
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor