+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- See SF3656, Art. 45, Sec. 3, Sub. 2
- Author added Marty
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Author added Abeler
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Author added Relph
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading