+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 1, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter number 150
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/16
On May 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 150 05/22/16
On May 22, 2016 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/22/2016
- Governor approval 05/22/16
On May 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/22/16
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/20/16
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/20/16
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading
- Bill was passed
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 19, 2016
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 2742
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor