+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Author added Dziedzic
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State and Local Government
- Author added Westrom
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation and Public Safety
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor