+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass Joint rule 2.03 Suspended
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor