+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Author added Bigham
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Author added Newton
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Author added Nelson
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Author added Wiger
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading