+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 1, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter number 85
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/16
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 85 04/25/16
- Governor's action Approval 04/25/16
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 04/25/16
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 04/25/16
- Governor approval 04/25/16
- Presented to Governor 04/25/16
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading
- Bill was passed
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 21, 2016
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3000
- Received from Senate
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment and Energy
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development
- Introduction and first reading