+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter number 153
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date Sec. 1 05/23/16; Sec. 2 08/01/16
On May 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 153 05/22/16
On May 22, 2016 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/22/2016
- Governor approval 05/22/16
On May 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/22/16
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/20/16
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/20/16
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- House adopted SCC report and repassed bill
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference
- Third reading as amended by Conference
- House adopted conference committee report
- Conference committee report
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill
- Conference committee report
- Third reading
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Senate conferees Sheran, Lourey, and Rosen.
- Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed
- House conferees Kresha, Bennett, and Norton.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- House conferees Kresha; Bennett; Norton
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees Sheran; Lourey, Rosen
- Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- Returned from House with amendment
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Amended
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 13, 2016
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 2683
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Rules and Administration
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing
- Introduction and first reading