+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 4.20, interim disposition of bills, returned to Government Operations
- Second reading
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF172
- Received from Senate
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor